Global Patent Index - EP 1164253 A1

EP 1164253 A1 2001-12-19 - Cooling system for the shroud of paired rotor blades

Title (en)

Cooling system for the shroud of paired rotor blades

Title (de)

Kühlungssystem für die Abdeckplatten von Rotorschaufelpaaren

Title (fr)

Système de ventilation d'une paire de plates-formes d'aubes juxtaposées

Publication

EP 1164253 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401534 A

Priority

  • FR 0007611 A
  • US 88394801 A

Abstract (en)

The ventilation system for a pair of platforms (6) on adjacent turbine blades (4) covering a ventilation cavity (8) next to the turbine disc (1), incorporates a sheet metal sealing sleeve (9) with holes (12) under vents (11) in the platforms. The sealing sleeve has elongated recesses (13) under the platform vents, running parallel with the joint (7) between platforms and with the holes (12) in line with the vents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 5/16 (2006.01); F01D 5/26 (2006.01); F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/008 (2013.01); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2758855 A1 19980731 - SNECMA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164253 A1 20011219; EP 1164253 B1 20050302; FR 2810365 A1 20011221; FR 2810365 B1 20021011; JP 2002021503 A 20020123; JP 4047560 B2 20080213; US 6457935 B1 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES, FR

- Effective date: 20170717

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SNECMA

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050404

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60109093 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANTUNES, SERGE LOUIS

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIL, ERIC STEPHAN

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOURRIAUD, ISABELLE MONIQUE MARIE

2002-01-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JUDET MAURICE GUY

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI