Global Patent Index - EP 1164260 A1

EP 1164260 A1 2001-12-19 - Vibration decoupling fastening of an element to a structure

Title (en)

Vibration decoupling fastening of an element to a structure

Title (de)

Schwingungsentkoppelte Befestigung eines Bauteils an einer Struktur

Title (fr)

Fixation à découplage des vibrations d'un élément à une structure

Publication

EP 1164260 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01102017 A

Priority

DE 10024210 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10024210A1] A component (3) is attached to another structure (1) by a fixture which de-couples vibration between the two. The fixture is a U-shaped rail (6), one shank of which is beveled (7). Before the rail is installed, a U-shaped elastic sheath is pushed over the component (3) flange (4). The rail (6) is then pressed by screws (8) against the flange (2). The beveled edge (7) compresses the elastic element (5) holding the two components (1,3) together.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine schwingungsentkoppelte Befestigung eines Bauteils an einer Struktur, wobei Struktur und Bauteil je einen Flansch aufweisen und die Flansche durch ein elastisches Element schwingungstechnisch entkoppelt und mit einem Befestigungselement miteinander fest verbunden sind. Zur Reduzierung der Schallemission besteht vielfach die Aufgabe ein Bauteil mit einer Struktur, z.B. eine Ölwanne mit einem Kurbelgehäuse zu verbinden. Das Problem dieser Verbindung besteht darin, daß Bauteil und Struktur verschiedene Formgebung besitzen und zudem noch aus sehr unterschiedlichen Materialien bestehen. Erfindungsgemäß wird diese Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß Struktur und Bauteil mittels eines Befestigungselements verbunden werden, daß dabei das Befestigungselement aus einer im Querschnitt gesehen U-förmigen Schiene (6) bebildet wird, daß dabei mindestens ein Schenkel der Schiene (6) eine Anschrägung (7) aufweist, daß vor der Montage der Schiene (6) das U-förmig ausgebildete elastische Element (5) über den Flansch (4) des Bauteils (3) geschoben wird und daß anschließend die Schiene (6) mittels Schrauben (8) gegen den Flansch (2) der Struktur (1) gepreßt und durch die Anschrägung (7) das elastische Element (5) zusammengepreßt und Bauteil (3) und Struktur (1) fest und dichtend verbunden sind. Das Befestigungselement in Form einer Schiene (6) ermöglicht eine ausgesprochen montagefreundliche Befestigung auch dann, wenn das Bauteil (3) biegeweich ist und zwischen Struktur (1) und Bauteil (3) eine dichte Verbindung erreicht werden soll. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 10024210 A1 20011122; EP 1164260 A1 20011219; EP 1164260 B1 20050316

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100130

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-07-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105588 P 20050421

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020108

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI