Global Patent Index - EP 1164267 A1

EP 1164267 A1 2001-12-19 - Method for assembling a catalytic converter

Title (en)

Method for assembling a catalytic converter

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Zusammenbau eines katalytischen Umwandlers

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage d'un convertisseur catalytique

Publication

EP 1164267 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01112299 A

Priority

LU 90603 A

Abstract (en)

Method for assembling a catalytic converter, the catalytic converter obtained according to the method and the use of said catalytic converters in diesel engine exhaust lines. The method comprises the following steps: wrapping a mat around a catalyst monolith, stuffing said catalyst monolith together with the mat into a tubular shell, mounting an end cone to each side of the tubular shell, welding said end cones to the shell. The catalyst monolith is positioned inside said shell in such a way that the mat and the weldings of the end cones to the tubular shell overlap and that the mat is heated during welding to a temperature which causes the mat to expand in the overlapping region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2857 (2013.01); F01N 13/1894 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 2350/04 (2013.01); F01N 2450/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164267 A1 20011219; LU 90603 A1 20011217

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040521

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI