Global Patent Index - EP 1164283 A2

EP 1164283 A2 2001-12-19 - A fuel injection valve

Title (en)

A fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 1164283 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01114379 A

Priority

JP 2000184584 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injection valve (10) is provided with a valve needle (105) which is urged by the pressure of fuel in a control chamber (109) to a closed position where the valve needle (105) closes the fuel injection hole (103). A supply passage (209) with a throttled portion connects a high pressure fuel passage (123) to the control chamber (109). The control chamber (109) is connected to a leak chamber (130) by two return passages (201,203). The leak chamber (130) has a leak passage (117) for spilling fuel in the leak chamber (130) to the outside of the fuel injection valve (10). A control valve (300) is provided in the leak chamber (130). The control valve (300) is capable of taking any of a closed position where the leak passage (117) is closed, a medium lift position where the leak passage (117) and two return passages (201,203) are opened, and a full lift position where the leak passage (117) and only one return passage (201)are opened. In the closing position of the control valve (300), the pressure in the control chamber (109) is high and the valve needle (105) is kept at the closing position. In the medium lift position and the full lift position, fuel in the control chamber (109) is spilled through the leak passage (117) via return passages (201,203) and the leak chamber (130). This causes the valve needle (105) to move to the position where the fuel injection hole (103) is opened. However, at the full lift position, since only one return passage (201) is opened, the rate of the pressure drop in the control chamber (109) is smaller and the speed of the lift of the valve needle (105) is lower. Therefore, the fuel injection characteristics can be changed by switching the position of the control valve (300) between the medium lift position and the full lift position during fuel injection. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 45/12 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 45/12 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H0571438 A 19930323 - NIPPON DENSO CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164283 A2 20011219; EP 1164283 A3 20031105; EP 1164283 B1 20061213; DE 60125098 D1 20070125; DE 60125098 T2 20070628; ES 2277601 T3 20070716; JP 2001355533 A 20011226; JP 3551898 B2 20040811

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090614

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090613

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090613

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090613

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080609

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277601 T3

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60125098 P 20070125

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-01-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI