Global Patent Index - EP 1164294 A1

EP 1164294 A1 2001-12-19 - Gas friction pump

Title (en)

Gas friction pump

Title (de)

Gasreibungspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à gaz à friction

Publication

EP 1164294 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01110210 A

Priority

  • DE 10023799 A
  • DE 10111546 A

Abstract (en)

The gas friction pump comprises a casing in which are located rotor and stator components for the feed of gases and creation of a pressure ratio. A modified rotor component(16) with a gas feeding structure is located on the side of the suction port in the casing, and its radial extent increases from the suction port in the direction of the other rotor and stator components. The radial extent of the modified rotor component increases in steps or continuously. The modified rotor component has completely or partially a conical or cupola form.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Gasreibungspumpe, deren Ansaugöffnung (2) einen Innendurchmesser aufweist, der kleiner ist als der Außendurchmesser der Rotor- und Statorbauteile (12, 14). Auf der Seite der Ansaugöffnung ist ein abgewandeltes Rotorbauteil (16) angebracht. Dessen radiale Ausdehnung nimmt von der Ansaugöffnung aus in Richtung der übrigen Rotor- und Statorbauteile zu. Die Zunahme erfolgt entweder in Stufen oder kontinuierlich in konischer oder kuppelförmiger Bauweise. Gegenüber dem abgewandelten Rotorbauteil ist ein Statorbauteil mit pumpaktiver Struktur versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 17/16; F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/042 (2013.01); F04D 29/324 (2013.01); F04D 29/4213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164294 A1 20011219; EP 1164294 B1 20030910; JP 2002005079 A 20020109; JP 5149472 B2 20130220

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180316

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PFEIFFER VACUUM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100591 P 20031016

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI