Global Patent Index - EP 1164322 A2

EP 1164322 A2 2001-12-19 - Pressure safety block with vibration damper for high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Pressure safety block with vibration damper for high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Regelsicherheitsblock mit Schwingungsdämpfer für Hochdruckreiniger

Title (fr)

Bloc de sûreté de pression avec amortiseur de vibrations pour un nettoyeur à haute pression

Publication

EP 1164322 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01114210 A

Priority

DE 10029226 A

Abstract (en)

The regulating safety unit has an oscillation damper in the form of a damping piston(30) connected in an axial extension to the unit's control piston(5). The damping piston by its damping component has sealed engagement in a damping bore(21) which in the region of one end side opens out into the return(13), and in the region of the other end is connected to a chamber of pressure difference in comparison to the high pressure in the passage(7) in front of sealing cone(32) between the HP inlet(6) and LP-side return, and in comparison to the lower pressure in the return passage(12) behind the sealing cone.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Regelsicherheitsblock (1) mit Schwingungsdämpfer (30,40) für Hochdruckreiniger, welcher Regelsicherheitsblock (1) derartig mit einer HD-Pumpe des Hochdruckreinigers gekoppelt ist, dass in seinem Betriebszustand bei geöffneter Hochdruckpistole das Medium hochdruckseitig über einen HD-Einlaß und anschließend einen HD-Auslaß des Regelsicherheitsblocks zur Hochdruckpistole gelangt und dass in seinem Bypass-Zustand bei geschlossener Hochdruckpistole das Medium vom HD-Einlaß über entsprechende Kanäle und einen Rücklauf des Regelsicherheitsblocks zu den niederdruckseitigen Kanälen der HD-Pumpe des Hochdruckreinigers gelangt, wobei sich zwischen dem HD-Einlaß und dem niederdruckseitigen Rücklauf ein Dichtkegel zur Volumenstromregulierung des Mediums befindet, welcher Dichtkegel im Betriebszustand mittels eines kraftbelasteten Steuerkolbens auf einen Dichtsitz gepresst wird, wodurch die Verbindung zwischen HD-Einlaß und dem niederdruckseitigen Rücklauf gesperrt wird, und welcher Dichtkegel im Bypass-Zustand mittels des Steuerkolbens vom Dichtsitz abgehoben wird durch den entstehenden Überdruck des Mediums in einem Druckraum an der der Kraftbeaufschlagung entgegengesetzten Stirnseite des Steuerkolbens, wobei der Schwingungsdämpfer in Form eines Dämpfungskolbens etwa in axialer Verlängerung mit dem Steuerkolben des Regelsicherheitsblockes verbunden ist, welcher Dämpfungskolben mit seinem Dämpfungsglied in eine Dämpfungsbohrung dichtend eingreift, welche im Bereich ihrer einen Stirnseite in den Rücklauf mündet und im Bereich ihrer anderen Stirnseite mit einem Raum unterschiedlichen Druckes verbunden ist. Vorteil hierbei ist, dass die Schwingungen des Steuerkolbens des Regelsicherheitsblockes durch den im Niederdruck-Rücklauf befindlichen Dämpfungskolben, welcher über den Dichtkegel mit dem Steuerkolben verbunden ist, geeignet gedämpft werden können, ohne kosten- und platzintensive hydropneumatische Dämpfungselemente einsetzen zu müssen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/035 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164322 A2 20011219; EP 1164322 A3 20030319; EP 1164322 B1 20040310; DE 10029226 A1 20020103; DE 10029226 C2 20031106; DK 1164322 T3 20040705

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070612

2008-02-18 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-06-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-06-06 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060606

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-05-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-07-05 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101640 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI