Global Patent Index - EP 1164334 A2

EP 1164334 A2 2001-12-19 - Manifold, esp. for heating installations

Title (en)

Manifold, esp. for heating installations

Title (de)

Rohrverteiler, insbesondere für Heizungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Distributeur, en particulier pour installations de chauffage

Publication

EP 1164334 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112525 A

Priority

DE 20010701 U

Abstract (en)

In the manifold housing (10), pipe pieces (4) are integrated at a distance (2A) from each other which is twice the grating distance (A). The pipe pieces run from the upper wall (11') of the manifold housing, through the upper chamber (2), downwardly through the dividing wall, into the lower chamber (3). The pipe pieces are sealingly closed at their upper ends until being connected to the pipework (5).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Rohrverteiler (1), insbesondere für Heizungsanlagen, mit einem länglichen kastenförmigen Verteilergehäuse (10) mit zwei Kammern (2, 3), wobei eine obere und eine untere Kammer (2, 3) übereinander angeordnet und durch eine Trennwand (13) voneinander getrennt sind und wobei oberseitig an das im Betrieb horizontal ausgerichteten Verteilergehäuse (10) in einem Rasterabstand (A) mehrere Rohrleitungen (5), von denen abwechselnd jeweils eine mit der oberen Kammer (2) und eine mit der unteren Kammer (3) in Strömungsverbindung tritt, anschließbar sind. Der neue Rohrverteiler ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß im Verteilergehäuse (10) in einem dem doppelten Rasterabstand (A) entsprechenden Abstand (2A) Rohrstücke (4) dichtend eingebaut sind, die von der oberen Wand (11') des Verteilergehäuses (10) durch die obere Kammer (2) nach unten durch die Trennwand (13) hindurch in die untere Kammer (3) verlaufen und die an ihrem oberen Ende bis zum Anschluß der Rohrleitungen (5) dicht verschlossen sind, wobei zum Anschluß der Rohrleitungen (5) Durchbrechungen (14) passender Größe und Lage am oberen Ende der Rohrstücke (4) und/oder in der oberen Wand (11') des Verteilergehäuses (10) anbringbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010701 U1 20011031; AT 283455 T 20041215; EP 1164334 A2 20011219; EP 1164334 A3 20030416; EP 1164334 B1 20041124

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104580

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100523

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090504

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATMED AG

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104580 P 20041230

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI NL

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI