Global Patent Index - EP 1164343 A1

EP 1164343 A1 2001-12-19 - Safety device for injection pistol of fluid in a container

Title (en)

Safety device for injection pistol of fluid in a container

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung für eine Pistole zum Einspritzen von Fluid in einen Behälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour pistolet d'injection de fluide dans un conteneur

Publication

EP 1164343 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01401448 A

Priority

FR 0007717 A

Abstract (en)

The safety (32) for a carbon dioxide injection pistol (18) for containers (10) has a sensor for pistol contact with the container connected to a control circuit for opening an electro-valve (28) integrated in the pistol to prevent injection of fluid if there is a loss of contact between the pistol and container. The sensor detects movement of the pistol and a relay (48) actuated under the control of the sensor to open a switch (50) connected in series with the control circuit to stop the fluid feed in case the pistol is moved. The sensor can be an acceleration sensor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 29/00; F25D 3/10; H01H 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01); F25D 3/12 (2006.01); H01H 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 3/10 (2013.01); F25D 29/001 (2013.01); F25D 3/12 (2013.01); H01H 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164343 A1 20011219; EP 1164343 B1 20041117; DE 60107148 D1 20041223; DE 60107148 T2 20051215; ES 2233578 T3 20050616; FR 2810262 A1 20011221; FR 2810262 B1 20020830

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233578 T3

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107148 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. AE DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SU

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI