Global Patent Index - EP 1164347 A2

EP 1164347 A2 2001-12-19 - Device for feeding large calibre shells in a heavy artillery gun, in particular a self-propelled howitzer

Title (en)

Device for feeding large calibre shells in a heavy artillery gun, in particular a self-propelled howitzer

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Zuführung von grosskalibrigen Geschossen zu einer schweren Waffe, insbesondere einer Panzerhaubitze

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en obus de grand calibre d'un canon lourd, en particulier des obusiers blindés

Publication

EP 1164347 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113873 A

Priority

DE 10029477 A

Abstract (en)

A unit on the delivery casing (1) brakes and secures the inlaid shell (GS) in the axial direction. A projectile rest (3) supports the curving front region of the shell, near the tip. The rest is located on a support lever rod (4, 5), which sinks down against spring force. Its descent can be locked on the guide path (2) using a blocking unit.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung zur Zuführung von großkalibrigen Geschossen zu einer schweren Waffe, insbesondere einer Panzerhaubitze. Die Geschosse werden in eine Bereitschaftsschale (1) eingelegt, die in horizontaler Richtung auf einer Führungsbahn (2) verschiebbar ist. An der Bereitschaftsschale (1) ist eine Vorrichtung zum Abbremsen und Festhalten eines in die Bereitschaftsschale eingelegten Geschosses in axialer Richtung angeordnet. Sie besitzt eine Geschoßauflage (3) zur Abstützung des Geschosses im Bereich der Ogive. Die Geschoßauflage (3) ist auf einem gegen Federkraft absenkbaren Stützhebelgestänge (4 - 5) angeordnet, das als Kniehebelsystem ausgebildet ist und dessen Absenkbewegung mittels einer Sperrvorrichtung verriegelbar ist, die eine am einen Ende eines der Abstützhebel (5) des Kniehebelsystems angeordnete Sperrklinke (5.3) aufweist, die in eine Sperrzahnstange (7) eingreifen kann, welche anhebbar und absenkbar angeordnet ist, wobei die Anhebung und Absenkung der Sperrzahnstange (7) durch einen Gleitschuh (8) gesteuert wird, der während der Verschiebung der Bereitschaftsschale (1) auf einer Steuerleiste (9) gleitet, die fest unterhalb der Bereitschaftsschale (1) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/09 (2006.01); F42B 39/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 39/22 (2013.01); F41A 9/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164347 A2 20011219; EP 1164347 A3 20031119; EP 1164347 B1 20040915; AT 276503 T 20041015; DE 10029477 A1 20011220; ES 2225355 T3 20050316; NO 20012910 A 20011217; NO 20012910 D0 20010613; NO 320219 B1 20051114; US 2002029687 A1 20020314; US 6470785 B2 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 276503 T

- Effective date: 20140607

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG#AUGUST-BODE-STRASSE 1#34127 KASSEL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KRAUSS-MAFFEI WEGMANN GMBH & CO. KG#AUGUST-BODE-STRASSE 1#34127 KASSEL (DE)

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225355 T3

2004-12-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103592 P 20041021

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040917

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI