Global Patent Index - EP 1164350 A2

EP 1164350 A2 2001-12-19 - Back-blast weapon training cartridge

Title (en)

Back-blast weapon training cartridge

Title (de)

Munitonskartusche zum Üben mit rückstossfreien Waffen

Title (fr)

Cartouche de munition pour l'entraînement avec des canons sans recul

Publication

EP 1164350 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01500145 A

Priority

ES 200001494 A

Abstract (en)

The object of this invention is an originally conceived back-blast weapon training cartridge consisting of a gas generator with an ignition device, a gas-operated striker device and a conventional bullet cartridge. This back-blast weapon training cartridge provides improvements and original elements over known training devices, particularly because it makes up a single member, to be inserted in the weapon in a single step, thereby reducing the risk of incidents in the use of training weapons of this kind, and contemporaneously expediting the storage and logistics of that ammunition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 8/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 8/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/06 (2013.01); F42B 8/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

ES 5405770 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164350 A2 20011219; EP 1164350 A3 20030827; ES 2183682 A1 20030316; ES 2183682 B1 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070103

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040108

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI