Global Patent Index - EP 1164367 A2

EP 1164367 A2 2001-12-19 - Optical device for use in detecting the wavelength and intensity of light

Title (en)

Optical device for use in detecting the wavelength and intensity of light

Title (de)

Optische Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Lichtwellenlänge und -intensität

Title (fr)

Dispositif optique pour détecter la longueur d'onde et l'intensité de la lumière

Publication

EP 1164367 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112280 A

Priority

JP 2000181015 A

Abstract (en)

An optical device capable of detecting the intensity and wavelength of light from a light source (LD) with a high level of precision, and an optical module (101) incorporating the optical device (1). The optical device (1) has a planar lightwave circuit (10) having a Y-branched core (16), a silicon substrate (20), a filter block (30), an optical fiber (40), and a first and a second photodiode (PD1, PD2). The end portion (16a) on the input side of the core (16) is connected to the optical fiber (40). One end portion (16b) on the output side of the core (16) is connected to the filter block (30), and the other (16c) on the same side is to the second photodiode (PD2). The light is divided at a predetermined ratio at the Y-branching portion (16h). One of the branched light is sent through the filter block (30) to be input to the first photodiode (PD1), and the other branched light is directly input to the second photodiode (PD2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01J 9/00; G01J 1/42; H01S 5/0687

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/42 (2006.01); G01J 1/42 (2006.01); G01J 9/00 (2006.01); G02B 6/12 (2006.01); G02B 6/122 (2006.01); G02B 6/125 (2006.01); G02B 6/132 (2006.01); G02B 6/136 (2006.01); H01L 31/0232 (2014.01); H01L 31/12 (2006.01); H01S 5/0683 (2006.01); H04B 10/07 (2013.01); H01S 5/022 (2006.01); H01S 5/0687 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 1/4257 (2013.01); G01J 9/00 (2013.01); G02B 6/12004 (2013.01); G02B 6/125 (2013.01); G02B 6/132 (2013.01); G02B 6/136 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12061 (2013.01); G02B 2006/121 (2013.01); G02B 2006/1215 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12154 (2013.01); G02B 2006/12173 (2013.01); H01S 5/02248 (2013.01); H01S 5/02284 (2013.01); H01S 5/0687 (2013.01); H01S 5/4087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164367 A2 20011219; EP 1164367 A3 20040714; CN 1329382 A 20020102; JP 2001358362 A 20011226; US 2001053265 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-05-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01J 9/00 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01J 1/42 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01S 5/0687 B

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI