Global Patent Index - EP 1164372 A2

EP 1164372 A2 2001-12-19 - Microchip-based differential carbon dioxide gas sensor

Title (en)

Microchip-based differential carbon dioxide gas sensor

Title (de)

Auf einem Mikrochip basierender Differenz-Kohlendioxidsensor

Title (fr)

Capteur différentiel de gaz dioxyde de carbone à base d'un microchip

Publication

EP 1164372 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113705 A

Priority

KR 20000032050 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a microchip-based differential-type carbon dioxide gas sensor for detecting dissolved carbon dioxide levels. It functions with at least one working electrode composed of an unbuffered hydrogel membrane containing a certain amount of sodium bicarbonate and a pH-sensitive gas-permeable membrane; and a reference electrode composed of a buffered hydrogel membrane and a pH-sensitive gas-permeable membrane. The unbuffered hydrogel membrane contains carbonic anhydrase, which reduces the time period for the hydration of carbon dioxide, thereby allowing the quick measurement of the level of carbon dioxide. In addition to being significantly improved in stabilization, sensing, and recovering time periods, the differential-type carbon dioxide gas sensor can be fabricated in small sizes and quickly measure levels of carbon dioxide dissolved in sample solution. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/416; G01N 27/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 27/333 (2006.01); G01N 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/333 (2013.01); G01N 27/4162 (2013.01); G01N 33/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164372 A2 20011219; EP 1164372 A3 20040519; EP 1164372 B1 20100303; AT 459874 T 20100315; DE 60141431 D1 20100415; KR 100379792 B1 20030411; KR 20010111514 A 20011219; US 2002011408 A1 20020131; US 6746583 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150603

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 459874 T

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60141431

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101206

2010-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2010-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60141431 P 20100415

2010-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OFFICE ERNEST T. FREYLINGER S.A.

2010-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2009-11-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 27/416 20060101AFI20091002BHEP

2009-11-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 27/333 20060101ALI20091002BHEP

2009-11-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MICROCHIP-BASED DIFFERENTIAL CARBON DIOXIDE GAS SENSOR

2009-11-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MICROCHIP-BASED DIFFERENTIAL-TYPECARBON DIOXIDE GAS SENSOR

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060718

2005-02-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 27/416 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 27/40 B

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, JAE SEON

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIN, JAE HO

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEE, MIN HYUNG

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NAM, HAKHYUN

2003-07-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHA, GEUN SIG

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010602

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI