Global Patent Index - EP 1164444 A1

EP 1164444 A1 2001-12-19 - ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE HAVING INDICATION HANDS

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE HAVING INDICATION HANDS

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHE UHR MIT ZEIGERANZEIGE

Title (fr)

MONTRE ELECTRONIQUE A AIGUILLES

Publication

EP 1164444 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00900897 A

Priority

JP 0000327 W

Abstract (en)

An electronic timepiece with indicator hands having a function of restricting a reciprocal movement range of the indicator hands is utilized to realize a variety of indications, which comprises: time hands (101, 102) for showing time; first and second indicator hands (103, 104) provided separately from the time hands (101, 102); a motor (200) for alternately performing forward rotation and reverse rotation by a predetermined amount; a wheel train for reciprocally rotating the first and second indicator hands (103, 104) in directions opposite from each other within a predetermined range; a support part supporting a wheel constituting the train wheel; and restricting means for restricting the range of rotation of a wheel (211) included in the train wheel to thereby restrict rotation of the indicator hands (103, 104) within a predetermined restriction range; wherein the support part is formed with a space (230) for arranging another wheel (229) such that the other wheel (229) can be arranged in the train wheel in place of the wheel (211) to be restricted in rotation range by the restricting means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/00; G04B 45/00; G04C 3/00; G04C 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/00 (2006.01); G04B 19/02 (2006.01); G04B 19/04 (2006.01); G04B 45/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/00 (2006.01); G04C 3/14 (2006.01); G04C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 19/048 (2013.01); G04B 19/04 (2013.01); G04B 45/003 (2013.01); G04B 45/0061 (2013.01); G04C 3/008 (2013.01); G04C 3/146 (2013.01); G04C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164444 A1 20011219; EP 1164444 A4 20051005; AU 3077200 A 20010807; CN 1344385 A 20020410; JP 3875559 B2 20070131; WO 0155801 A1 20010802

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060804

2005-10-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI