Global Patent Index - EP 1164507 A2

EP 1164507 A2 2001-12-19 - Database updating method using recordable optical disc and apparatuses therefor

Title (en)

Database updating method using recordable optical disc and apparatuses therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aktualisieren einer Datenbank mit einer schreibaren optischen Platte und entsprechenden Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Méthode de mise à jour d'une base de données à l'aide d'un disque optique réinscriptible et appareils correspondants

Publication

EP 1164507 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304775 A

Priority

KR 20000033463 A

Abstract (en)

A method, which enables online modification or update of a database stored on a recordable optical disc and an apparatus thereof are provided. The information updating apparatus includes a computer network (102); a server (106) for providing database-related information through the computer network (102); and a user computer (104) for accessing the server through the computer network and retrieving the database-related information. The user computer (104) includes an optical disc recording/reproducing apparatus (104e) for recording data in or reproducing data from an optical disc (108), in which a database and the date and time of the last update is recorded, and is programmed to record modified/updated data, which is transmitted from the server, on the optical disc. The server (106) is programmed so that the server receives the date and time of the last update, which is recorded on the optical disc (108) and transmitted from the user computer (104), and if modification/update is needed, transmits modified/updated data to the user computer (104) in order for the user computer to record the modified/updated data on the optical disc (108) through the optical disc recording/reproducing apparatus (104e). The method and apparatuses provide a user with a means for easily making the user database always updated with latest data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30345 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164507 A2 20011219; EP 1164507 A3 20040728; CN 1338692 A 20020306; JP 2002049518 A 20020215; KR 20010113235 A 20011228; US 2002046176 A1 20020418; US 7430541 B2 20080930

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080422

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040910

2005-04-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-07-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI