Global Patent Index - EP 1164516 A1

EP 1164516 A1 2001-12-19 - Method for automatic order processing

Title (en)

Method for automatic order processing

Title (de)

Verfahren zur automatischen Auftragsfreigabe und Auftragsvergabe

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le traitement automatique des commandes

Publication

EP 1164516 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112504 A

Priority

EP 00112504 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves transmitting an offer with relevant data to a data concentrator and evaluating the data using data concentrator data and test criteria. If the assessment is positive the order is initiated, the data are accepted into the concentrator and an initiation code passed to the data communications device; if negative the data are accepted and a fake code can be passed to the data communications device for the offer. The method involves repeating a sequence as required, including transmitting an offer with relevant data to a data concentrator (3) via a data communications device (1) and telecommunications network (2) and evaluating the data using data available in the data concentrator and test criteria. If the assessment is positive the order is initiated using a code related to the offer, the data are accepted into the concentrator and the initiation code (5) is passed to the data communications device. If the assessment is negative the data are accepted into the data concentrator and a fake code can be passed to the data communications device for the offer.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur automatischen Auftragsfreigabe und Auftragsvergabe mittels Datenkommunikationsvorrichtungen, Datenkonzentrationsvorrichtungen und Telekommunikationsvorrichtungen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); H03F 1/26 (2006.01); H04B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164516 A1 20011219; AU 6603401 A 20011224; US 2003158711 A1 20030821; WO 0197102 A2 20011220; WO 0197102 A3 20020404

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060810

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020619;LT PAYMENT 20020619;LV PAYMENT 20020619;MK PAYMENT 20020619;RO PAYMENT 20020619;SI PAYMENT 20020619

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI