Global Patent Index - EP 1164572 A2

EP 1164572 A2 2001-12-19 - Device for contolling the air in organs

Title (en)

Device for contolling the air in organs

Title (de)

Windregler für Orgeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de l'air pour des orgues

Publication

EP 1164572 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01103075 A

Priority

DE 20010775 U

Abstract (en)

The wind regulator is connected directly to the organ blower exit opening, which is covered by a flap (4) and an escape channel (5). A roll valve (2) is joined to the flap by two connecting rods (3), and to the bellows (8) via a cable (7) or lever. The imperfect seal causes the bellows to fall slightly, opening the roll valve until the leakage is equalised. The escape channel is used to equalise air leakage when the flap is kept closed by the rods. As the organ is played, the bellows fall even further and the roll valve is opened more, causing the flap to open.

Abstract (de)

Ein Windregler für Orgeln, der zwischen einem Orgelgebläse und dem im Gebläsekanal nachfolgenden Balgsystem angeordnet ist und durch das Balgsystem zum Öffnen oder Schließen eines Ventils verstellt wird, ist erfindungsgemäß zur Vermeidung von Geräuschen am Ventil, bei geringem Windbedarf wie etwa nur bei minimalem Windverschleich dahingehend weiterentwickelt, daß der Windregler einen schallgedämmten Schleichkanal für einen auf den Windverschleich der Orgel ausgelegten Winddurchsatz aufweist, der im Luftweg des Windreglers parallel zu einem Durchgangskanal angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010775 U1 20001214; EP 1164572 A2 20011219; EP 1164572 A3 20070620

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130903

2008-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080804

2008-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2008-02-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20070907

- Countries: SI

2007-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070907

2007-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI