Global Patent Index - EP 1164602 A2

EP 1164602 A2 2001-12-19 - Method for determining the position of an armature

Title (en)

Method for determining the position of an armature

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Position eines Ankers

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer la position d'une armature

Publication

EP 1164602 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01110620 A

Priority

DE 10020896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10020896A1] The position detection method determines the current through the energizing coil (12a,12b) of the electromagnetic setting device, used for operation of the armature (6), together with voltage across the energizing coil, with calculation of the energizing coil magnetic flux by integration of the induced voltage. The actual position of the armature is provided by a characteristic field or a calculation function indicating the relationship between the magnetic flux, the current and the armature position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Bestimmen der Position eines Ankers, der einem Stellantrieb zugeordnet ist, wobei der Stellantrieb mindestens einen Elektromagneten mit mindestens einer Erregerspule aufweist, wobei der Anker zwischen einer ersten Anlagefläche an dem Elektromagneten und einer zweiten Anlagefläche bewegt wird und der Strom in und gegebenenfalls der Spannungsabfall an der wenigstens einen Erregerspule ermittelt wird, und der magnetische Fluss Φ durch die Erregerspule durch Integration der induzierten Spannung ermittelt wird, wobei die induzierte Spannung entweder berechnet wird aus dem Strom durch die Erregerspule unter Berücksichtigung des Betriebszustandes der Leistungsendstufe oder aus dem Strom durch die Erregerspule und dem Spannungsabfall an der Erregerspule ermittelt wird und dass die Wegposition durch ein Kennfeld oder eine Funktion, das bzw. die den Zusammenhang zwischen dem magnetischen Fluss Φ, dem Strom I und der Wegposition abbildet, ermittelt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/18; F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); H01F 7/1844 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0409 (2013.01); F01L 2820/02 (2013.01); H01F 2007/1684 (2013.01); H01F 2007/185 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10020896 A1 20011031; EP 1164602 A2 20011219; EP 1164602 A3 20020807

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI