Global Patent Index - EP 1164612 A1

EP 1164612 A1 2001-12-19 - Acceleration value limiting switch

Title (en)

Acceleration value limiting switch

Title (de)

Beschleunigungsgrenzwertschalter

Title (fr)

Détecteur de valeurs limites d'accélération

Publication

EP 1164612 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01113786 A

Priority

DE 10029087 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a spherical inertial body (3) held in a rest position by a permanent magnet (2) with an opposing elastic conductive membrane (4) and circuit board (5). When stimulated the inertial body moves, impacts on the membrane and makes a contact between the conducting tracks. The cavity (1d) accommodating the inertial body causes a directionally selective triggering characteristic as a result of its shape.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Beschleunigungsgrenzwertschalter mit einem kugelförmigen Trägheitskörper, der von einem Dauermagneten in einer Ruhestellung gehalten wird. Über dem Trägheitskörper ist eine leitfähige Membran befestigt, der eine Leiterplatte gegenüber steht. Bekannt ist es, den Trägheitskörper in einem trichterförmigen Raum zu lagern. Da dieser rotationssymmetrisch ist, gibt es keine bevorzugte Ansprechrichtung. Da für bestimmte Anwendungsfälle eine richtungsabhängige Auslösung gefordert wird, liegt der Erfindung die Aufgabe zugrunde, einen derartigen Schalter mit Vorzugsrichtung zu schaffen. Erfindungsgemäß wird der Bewegungsraum des Trägheitskörpers so umgestaltet, dass er nur in einer Richtung zur kontaktgebenden Membran rollen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 35/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164612 A1 20011219; EP 1164612 B1 20030502; AT 239298 T 20030515; DE 10029087 A1 20011220; ES 2193122 T3 20031101; PT 1164612 E 20030930; US 2002053502 A1 20020509

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100203

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50100203

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060607

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060606

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-12-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061206

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-06-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060607

2006-06-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060606

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-01 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HELBAKO G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1164612E

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193122 T3

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50100203 P 20030605

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELBAKO GMBH

2002-10-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI