Global Patent Index - EP 1164657 A1

EP 1164657 A1 2001-12-19 - Multiband antenna

Title (en)

Multiband antenna

Title (de)

Multiband-Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne multibandes

Publication

EP 1164657 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01660108 A

Priority

FI 20001387 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a multiband antenna structure suitable for mobile stations in particular. The radiating elements of the antenna include not only a helix (210) but also the joining piece (220) that attaches the helix to the apparatus. The helix is shaped such that the distance between its conductor turns varies. The electrical length of the joining piece is increased e.g. by means of a conductive projection (226) that remains within the covering of the apparatus. By suitably dimensioning the parts, at least five of the resonances that the helix and joining piece have together and separately are arranged at useful points on the frequency scale. The structure according to the invention is despite the several bands simple and relatively low in production costs. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/36 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 5/357 (2015.01); H01Q 9/40 (2006.01); H01Q 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/362 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 5/357 (2013.01); H01Q 9/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164657 A1 20011219; CN 1213511 C 20050803; CN 1336700 A 20020220; FI 113220 B 20040315; FI 20001387 A0 20000612; FI 20001387 A 20011213; US 2001050656 A1 20011213; US 6473056 B2 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111018

2006-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PULSE FINLAND OY

2005-10-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LK PRODUCTS OY

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040503

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB SE

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI