Global Patent Index - EP 1164658 A2

EP 1164658 A2 2001-12-19 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1164658 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01401461 A

Priority

FR 0007570 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connector has a male section (2) and a female part with an intermediate band (3), with strips (4) and side bands (5,6), with tongulets (7). The tongulet has a first face curve towards the holder (8) and an extended face (13) pushing against the side wall (9) of the holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4881 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164658 A2 20011219; EP 1164658 A3 20020515; EP 1164658 B1 20040331; AT 263439 T 20040415; CA 2350125 A1 20011214; CA 2350125 C 20091013; CN 1221065 C 20050928; CN 1329380 A 20020102; DE 60102516 D1 20040506; DE 60102516 T2 20050224; FR 2810463 A1 20011221; FR 2810463 B1 20040305; TW 492225 B 20020621; US 2001055919 A1 20011227; US 6435922 B2 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-17 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150610

2015-06-17 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150610

2013-09-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130815 AND 20130821

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T AND D SA, FR

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM GRID SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60102516

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-06-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60102516

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60102516

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60102516

- Representative's name: DREISS PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2012-12-05 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121129

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2006-04-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: AREVA T & D SA

- Free text: ALSTOM#25, AVENUE KLEBER#75116 PARIS (FR) -TRANSFER TO- AREVA T & D SA#1, PLACE DE LA COUPOLE TOUR AREVA#92084 PARIS LA DEFENSE (FR)

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-01-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2004-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040712

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040606

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60102516 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KEISER, MARKUS

2004-03-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAGNER, PETER

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI