Global Patent Index - EP 1164727 A1

EP 1164727 A1 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for decoding digital audio data

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for decoding digital audio data

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dekodierung von digitalen Audiodaten

Title (fr)

Procedé et appareil pour décodage des dates audionumériques

Publication

EP 1164727 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01112265 A

Priority

DE 10027970 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves carrying out a first stage of decoding MP3 data with a processor (8) and decoding MP2 data and carrying out second stage decoding of MP3 data using an audio decoder (9). Decoding of MP2 and MP3 data is controled by a controler (4) and if appropriate the decoded audio data are converted to a predefined clock rate using a sampling rate converter (10). Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for decoding digital audio data.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zur Dekodierung von digitalen Audiodaten bzw. eine Vorrichtung zur Dekodierung von digitalen Audiodaten vorgeschlagen, die dazu dienen, auf einer bestehenden Hardware eines MP2-Audiodekoders einen MP3-Audiodekoder zusätzlich zu implementieren. Dabei wird ein Teil der Hardware für die MP2-Dekodierung für die MP3-Dekodierung mitgenutzt und zwar insbesondere die rechenintensive Filterbank. Die anderen Schritte der Audiodekodierung für MP3-Daten werden mittels eines Prozessors ausgeführt. Eine MP3-Dekodierung wird unterbrochen, falls in den Rundfunksignalen, die Audiodaten nach MP2 kodiert aufweisen oder die FM-Signale sind, eine Verkehrsnachricht übertragen wird, um dann diese Verkehrsnachricht durchzuschalten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/95 (2008.01); G11B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/95 (2013.01); G11B 20/00007 (2013.01); G11B 2020/10546 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164727 A1 20011219; EP 1164727 B1 20030409; DE 10027970 A1 20011220; DE 10027970 B4 20070308; TW 504906 B 20021001

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170518

2018-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170518

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170718

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160519

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50100152

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1164727E

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI