Global Patent Index - EP 1164761 A2

EP 1164761 A2 2001-12-19 - DPSK system with varible data rates

Title (en)

DPSK system with varible data rates

Title (de)

DPSK-System mit veränderbaren Datenraten

Title (fr)

Système MDPD à débit variable

Publication

EP 1164761 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113000 A

Priority

US 59528500 A

Abstract (en)

The DPSK modulation system in accordance with the present invention includes a transmitter, which includes a carrier signal source, a phase modulator and a DPSK encoder for modulating a carrier signal. The modulated carrier signals may be amplified, for example, in optical communication systems, by a rare-earth-element-doped fibre amplifier. The multi-rate receiver includes a single demodulator, for example, a single optical interferometer, used for multiple sub-harmonic data rates, which demodulates the modulated signal. The demodulated signals are detected, for example, in optical communication systems, by an arrangement of photodiodes, and the detected signals are applied to, for example, a clock and data recovery circuit that is tuned as a function of data rate, for example, by way of a switched filter circuit. The switched filter circuit may include a plurality of low-pass filters, that are selected as a function of the data rate. Since the carrier signal is continuously transmitted, a phase reference is available to demodulate all received power and the peak transmitted power is approximately equal to the average transmitted power even at data rates corresponding to bit times that are large compared to the differential time delay of the demodulator. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 10/04 (2006.01); H04B 10/06 (2006.01); H04B 10/142 (2006.01); H04B 10/152 (2006.01); H04L 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164761 A2 20011219; EP 1164761 A3 20040107; CA 2350413 A1 20011215; JP 2002064574 A 20020228; US 6826371 B1 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUCH, JEFFREY S.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUMES, TODD E.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTH, JAMES A.

2004-05-19 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 27/18 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 27/233 B

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUCH, JEFFREY S.

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUMES, TODD E.

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROTH, JAMES A.

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI