Global Patent Index - EP 1164763 A2

EP 1164763 A2 2001-12-19 - Predistortion in a 12/4 star QAM modulator

Title (en)

Predistortion in a 12/4 star QAM modulator

Title (de)

Vorverzerrung in einem 12/4-Stern-QAM-Modulator

Title (fr)

Prédistortion dans un modulateur de signaux MAQ en forme d'étoile 12/4

Publication

EP 1164763 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01112840 A

Priority

US 59332800 A

Abstract (en)

Methods and devices for predistorted 12/4 Quadrature Amplitude Modulation that compensate for distortion from a nonlinear element. Modulator input bits are mapped (40) to a plurality of nonreturn-to-zero (NRZ) modulator control bit (20-30). The mapping is determined by desired points on a 12/4 QAM constellation. At least one phase shift device (4, 6) receives an input signal and at least one of the plurality of modulator control bit. At least two quaternary phase shift keying (QPSK) devices (8, 10) receive phase shifted signals from at least one phase shift device. Each of at least two QPSK devices receives at least one of the plurality of NRZ symbols. An attenuator (32) that attenuates a first QPSK signal outputted from a first QPSK device of the at least two QPSK devices. A summer (34) sums the attenuated first QPSK signal with a second QPSK signal. The second QPSK signal is outputted from a second QPSK device of the two QPSK devices. The summer outputs a predistorted 12/4-QAM signal. The plurality of modulator control bit control the at least one phase shift devices and the two QPSK modulators to achieve the desired points on the 12/4 QAM constellation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/04 (2006.01); H04L 27/01 (2006.01); H04L 27/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/368 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1164763 A2 20011219; EP 1164763 A3 20041201; EP 1164763 B1 20081217; DE 60136994 D1 20090129; JP 2002158728 A 20020531; JP 3527716 B2 20040517; US 6674811 B1 20040106

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090530

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090530

2009-11-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136994 P 20090129

2008-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061009

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI