EP 1165123 A4 20020911 - 48 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS
Title (en)
48 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS
Title (de)
48 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE
Title (fr)
48 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0007525 W 20000322
- US 12659599 P 19990326
- US 17154999 P 19991222
Abstract (en)
[origin: CA2368442A1] Published without an abstract
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61P 1/04 (2017.12); A61P 7/06 (2017.12); A61P 11/06 (2017.12); A61P 17/06 (2017.12); A61P 19/02 (2017.12); A61P 29/00 (2017.12); A61P 31/00 (2017.12); A61P 35/00 (2017.12); A61P 37/00 (2017.12); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 9846756 A1 19981022 - MILLENNIUM BIOTHERAPEUTICS [US]
- [X] US 5792628 A 19980811 - BOWMAN MICHAEL [US]
- [X] EP 0879887 A1 19981125 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
- [X] WO 9851790 A1 19981119 - AMRAD OPERATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al
- [PX] WO 0009525 A2 20000224 - UNIV EAST CAROLINA [US], et al
- [X] DATABASE EMBL 16 February 1998 (1998-02-16), XP002194739
- [X] DATABASE EMBL 12 November 1998 (1998-11-12), XP002194740
- [X] DATABASE EMBL 10 February 1999 (1999-02-10), XP002194741
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0057903 A2 20001005; AU 3766800 A 20001016; CA 2368442 A1 20001005; EP 1165123 A1 20020102; EP 1165123 A4 20020911; JP 2002539811 A 20021126
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0007525 W 20000322; AU 3766800 A 20000322; CA 2368442 A 20000322; EP 00916584 A 20000322; JP 2000607653 A 20000322