Global Patent Index - EP 1165242 B1

EP 1165242 B1 2002-11-27 - ELECTRODEPOSITION DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRODEPOSITION DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRO-ABSCHEIDEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ELECTRODEPOSITION

Publication

EP 1165242 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916746 A

Priority

  • DE 0000427 W
  • DE 29905302 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056461A1] The invention relates to an electrodeposition device, having two or more emission electrodes that can be connected to a common electrical supply line and an electrically insulating electrode holder, wherein the electrode holder is made of plastic and receives the electrodes, the electrical connections thereof and a contact surface for the connection to the electrical supply line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/70; B03C 3/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/70 (2006.01); B03C 3/41 (2006.01); B03C 3/60 (2006.01); B03C 3/66 (2006.01); F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2013.01); B03C 3/41 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0466 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905302 U1 19990617; BR 0009202 A 20011226; EP 1165242 A1 20020102; EP 1165242 B1 20021127; JP 2002539923 A 20021126; US 6616817 B1 20030909; WO 0056461 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100210

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100210

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080210

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000834 20030109

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENGST GMBH & CO. KG

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010723

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE