Global Patent Index - EP 1165591 A4

EP 1165591 A4 2002-09-25 - 47 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

47 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

47 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

47 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1165591 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00916590 A

Priority

  • US 0007534 W
  • US 12659899 P
  • US 17150499 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0058335A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/04; C07K 14/00; C07K 16/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/85; C12N 15/86; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); C07K 2319/02 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9846756 A1 19981022 - MILLENNIUM BIOTHERAPEUTICS [US]
  • [X] US 5792628 A 19980811 - BOWMAN MICHAEL [US]
  • [X] EP 0879887 A1 19981125 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [PX] WO 9947540 A1 19990923 - DUAN ROXANNE D [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0055173 A1 20000921 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0027994 A2 20000518 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 7 June 1997 (1997-06-07), XP002197004
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 6 January 1999 (1999-01-06), XP002197005
  • [X] DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 November 1996 (1996-11-01), XP002197006
  • [X] DATABASE SWISSPROT 15 December 1998 (1998-12-15), XP002197007
  • [X] DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 February 1994 (1994-02-01), XP002197008
  • [PX] DATABASE EMBL 27 April 1999 (1999-04-27), XP002197009
  • [PX] DATABASE EMBL 2 November 1999 (1999-11-02), XP002197010
  • [PX] DATABASE EMBL 1 February 2000 (2000-02-01), XP002197011
  • [PX] DATABASE EMBL 14 September 1999 (1999-09-14), XP002197012
  • See also references of WO 0058335A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058335 A1 20001005; AU 3767300 A 20001016; CA 2368374 A1 20001005; EP 1165591 A1 20020102; EP 1165591 A4 20020925; JP 2002539815 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041014

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI