Global Patent Index - EP 1165608 A4

EP 1165608 A4 2002-09-04 - A MEMBER OF THE FRZB FAMILY, FRAZZLED

Title (en)

A MEMBER OF THE FRZB FAMILY, FRAZZLED

Title (de)

FRAZZLED, EIN MITGLIED DER FRZB FAMILIE

Title (fr)

MEMBRE DE LA FAMILLE FRZB, FRAZZLED

Publication

EP 1165608 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00917976 A

Priority

  • US 0006820 W
  • US 12503899 P
  • US 51939700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0055202A1] Bos taurus Frazzled polypeptides and polynucleotides and method for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for screening for compounds which either agonize or antagonize Bos taurus Frazzled. Such compounds are expected to be useful in treatment of human diseases, including, but not limited to: chronic and acute inflammation, arthritis, rheumatoid arthritis, osteoarthritis, septicimia, autoimmune diseases (e.g., inflammatory bowel disease, psoriasis), transplant rejection, graft vs. host disease, infection, stoke, ischemia, acute respiratory disease syndrome, renal disorders, restenosis, brain injury, AIDS, metabolic and other bone diseases (e.g., osteoporosis), cancer (e.g., lymphoproliferative disorders), atherosclerosis, Alzheimer's disease, retinitis pigmentosa, macular degeneration, and any other degenerative eye diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/567

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/52 (2013.01); G01N 2333/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [E] EP 1138693 A1 20011004 - TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]
  • [X] DATABASE GENSEQ [online] EBI; 26 February 1999 (1999-02-26), CLINKENBEARD: "HOFNH30", XP002199179, Database accession no. AAW86801 & EP 0878479 A2 19981118 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
  • [XP] DATABASE EMBL [online] EBI; 21 October 1999 (1999-10-21), MARRA ET AL: "Human Q926333 lysophosphatidic acid receptor mRNA", XP002199180, Database accession no. AW107032
  • [XP] DATABASE GENSEQ [online] EBI; 13 September 1999 (1999-09-13), CHUN ET AL: "Murine EDG-5 receptor alpha subclone nucleotide sequence", XP002199181, Database accession no. AAX88748 & DATABASE GENSEQ [online] EBI; 13 September 1999 (1999-09-13), CHUN ET ALL: "Murine EDG-5 receptor alpha subclone protein", XP002199182, Database accession no. AAY24243CHUN ET ALLMurine EDG-5 receptor alpha subclone proteinGENSEQEBI19990913AAY24243 & WO 9933972 A1 19990708 - ALLELIX BIOPHARMA [CA], et al
  • [A] RATTNER AT AL: "A family of secreted proteins contains homology to the cystein-rich ligand-binding domain of frizzled receptors", PMAS USA, vol. 94, April 1997 (1997-04-01), pages 2859 - 2863, XP002199178
  • See also references of WO 0055202A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0055202 A1 20000921; EP 1165608 A1 20020102; EP 1165608 A4 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-09-04 [R18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-08-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2002-07-24 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020601

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE