Global Patent Index - EP 1165783 A4

EP 1165783 A4 2002-09-11 - 47 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

47 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

47 MENSCHLICHE, SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

47 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1165783 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00916585 A

Priority

  • US 0007526 W
  • US 12660099 P
  • US 17155099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2369458A1] Published without an abstract

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/47; C12N 5/10; C12P 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/53 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9846756 A1 19981022 - MILLENNIUM BIOTHERAPEUTICS [US]
  • [X] US 5792628 A 19980811 - BOWMAN MICHAEL [US]
  • [X] EP 0879887 A1 19981125 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [PX] WO 0009525 A2 20000224 - UNIV EAST CAROLINA [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9965929 A1 19991223 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9947535 A1 19990923 - MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0062736 A2 20001026 - UNIV EAST CAROLINA [US], et al
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 24 April 1998 (1998-04-24), XP002195100
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 14 May 1996 (1996-05-14), XP002195101
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 4 December 1997 (1997-12-04), XP002195102
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 13 February 1998 (1998-02-13), XP002195103
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 16 September 1995 (1995-09-16), XP002195104
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 18 March 1996 (1996-03-18), XP002195105
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 28 June 1994 (1994-06-28), XP002195106
  • [X] DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 May 1997 (1997-05-01), XP002195107

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058468 A2 20001005; AU 3766900 A 20001016; CA 2369458 A1 20001005; EP 1165783 A1 20020102; EP 1165783 A4 20020911; JP 2002539831 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030716

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011015

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI