Global Patent Index - EP 1165828 A4

EP 1165828 A4 2002-09-25 - 50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

50 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

50 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1165828 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00919570 A

Priority

  • US 0007722 W
  • US 12650899 P
  • US 17487100 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0058496A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/04 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9846756 A1 19981022 - MILLENNIUM BIOTHERAPEUTICS [US]
  • [X] US 5792628 A 19980811 - BOWMAN MICHAEL [US]
  • [X] EP 0879887 A1 19981125 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]
  • [E] WO 0058350 A1 20001005 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
  • [E] WO 0027994 A2 20000518 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 25 July 1996 (1996-07-25), XP002195263
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 25 July 1996 (1996-07-25), XP002195264
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 8 January 1998 (1998-01-08), XP002195265
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 24 August 1998 (1998-08-24), XP002195266
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL 27 October 1994 (1994-10-27), XP002195267
  • [X] DATABASE SWISSPROT 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), XP002195268
  • [PX] DATABASE EMBL 6 August 1999 (1999-08-06), XP002195262
  • See also references of WO 0058496A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058496 A1 20001005; AU 4023200 A 20001016; CA 2370441 A1 20001005; EP 1165828 A1 20020102; EP 1165828 A4 20020925; JP 2002539843 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030715

2002-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 39/00 A, 7G 01N 33/53 B

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI