Global Patent Index - EP 1165910 A4

EP 1165910 A4 2003-06-04 - INTERACTIVE BUILDING MODULE

Title (en)

INTERACTIVE BUILDING MODULE

Title (de)

INTERAKTIVES GEBÄUDEMODUL

Title (fr)

MODULE DE BATIMENT INTERACTIF

Publication

EP 1165910 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00910428 A

Priority

  • AU 0000240 W
  • AU PP940899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057004A1] A modular building structure which can be converted between a variety of usage modes, such as an office, hotel or residential purposes. Each module includes fittings that allow for attachment and detachment of internal components to enable conversion between the usage modes. The modules may be joined in different ways, such as in a checkerboard configuration. Also disclosed are an exchange module to permit the secure exchange of items to or from the building structure to which access is permitted if authorisation information matches an access instruction, and a resource management system to control the use of resources such as electricity and water in which a resource source is chosen that meets rather than exceeds the requirements of the resource demand.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 14/00; A47G 29/28; E04B 1/348; E04F 11/18; E06B 7/084; E06B 7/086; E06B 9/323; H02J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01); E04H 1/06 (2006.01); E04H 3/00 (2006.01); E04H 3/02 (2006.01); E04H 14/00 (2006.01); E06B 7/086 (2006.01); F24F 5/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/348 (2013.01); E04H 1/06 (2013.01); E04H 3/02 (2013.01); E06B 7/086 (2013.01); F24F 5/0046 (2013.01); F24F 2007/004 (2013.01); Y02A 30/272 (2018.01); Y02B 10/20 (2013.01); Y02B 10/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057004 A1 20000928; AU 2004205265 A1 20040923; AU 2004205265 B2 20080925; AU 2007101006 A4 20071213; AU 2009220034 A1 20091015; AU 3264600 A 20001009; AU PP940899 A0 19990415; BR 0009270 A 20020604; CA 2366306 A1 20000928; CN 100342106 C 20071010; CN 101135198 A 20080305; CN 1349581 A 20020515; CN 1483910 A 20040324; EP 1165910 A1 20020102; EP 1165910 A4 20030604; EP 1722046 A2 20061115; EP 1722046 A3 20070221; JP 2002540324 A 20021126; MX PA01009568 A 20030819; US 2005279035 A1 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1044360

2007-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061002

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04H 14/00 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/348 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 47G 29/28 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 7/086 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 7/084 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/323 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04F 11/18 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02J 3/00 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04H 14/00 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/348 B

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI