Global Patent Index - EP 1165925 B1

EP 1165925 B1 2003-06-04 - FIXING ELEMENT FOR GLASS PANES

Title (en)

FIXING ELEMENT FOR GLASS PANES

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT FÜR GLASSCHEIBEN

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE FIXATION POUR VITRES

Publication

EP 1165925 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910862 A

Priority

  • DE 19913729 A
  • EP 0002425 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0058591A1] The invention relates to a fixing element for glass panes, comprising a thicker shorter bolt (1) which can be inserted into a hole in the glass (10) and sealed, and a longer but thinner bolt which can be fixed to the first bolt and presents an outer thread (2). The shorter bolt has a hole in the direction of the longer bolt and the thinner bolt is configured such that it can be pivoted in relation to the shorter bolt. The longer bolt (2) is further configured such that it can be pivoted in the manner of a cardan joint in the hole of the shorter bolt or in proximity thereto. The cardan-joint configuration in each case consists of a block (3) with two holes which are perpendicular to each other and into which two bolts (4, 4') can be introduced such that their ends protrude outwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/54; E04B 2/88; E04D 3/06; E04F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5436 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058591 A1 20001005; AT 242405 T 20030615; AU 3291400 A 20001016; EP 1165925 A1 20020102; EP 1165925 B1 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002454

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-12-13 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50002454

2011-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002454

2011-10-01 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 50002454

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ATJ G.M.B.H. SYSTEMBAUTEILE

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002454 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI