Global Patent Index - EP 1165961 B1

EP 1165961 B1 2002-09-04 - FUEL INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTOR FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1165961 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00929269 A

Priority

  • DE 0000969 W
  • DE 19914720 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060233A1] According to the invention the end faces (20, 30) of two axially adjacent injector modules (1, 5) of a fuel injector, which faces are pressed against each other in pairs, are subjected to a surface pressure which creates a high-pressure seal both between the high-pressure ports, situated in the injector modules, and of said ports towards the exterior. The end face (20, 30) is divided into a first and a second partial area (20, 30), the second partial area (30) being recessed in relation to the first partial area (20) by an axial depth (h). The first partial area (20) serves as a sealing area so that when the surface pressure is increased by application of a defined axial preloading force a very tight seal is obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 55/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/16 (2013.01); F02M 55/002 (2013.01); F02M 55/005 (2013.01); F02M 2200/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060233 A1 20001012; DE 19914720 A1 20001102; DE 19914720 B4 20051013; EP 1165961 A1 20020102; EP 1165961 B1 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120330

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1165961E

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000457 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010620

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE