Global Patent Index - EP 1166029 B1

EP 1166029 B1 2002-09-25 - METHOD FOR SIMULATING A BATTLEFIELD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SIMULATING A BATTLEFIELD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR GEFECHTSFELDSIMULATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR SIMULATION SUR UN CHAMP DE BATAILLE

Publication

EP 1166029 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00909191 A

Priority

  • DE 19915222 A
  • EP 0001276 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915222A1] The method involves real participants (11) in a training area firing shells at targets (12) in the training area and receiving indications of impact results with targets within the effective area of hypothetical simulated shell strikes. The targets and participants are exclusively in radio communication (15) with a central station (14) and all data relevant to the shell simulation are exchanged via the central station.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 3/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915222 A1 20001005; AU 3155900 A 20001023; AU 766586 B2 20031016; CA 2368821 A1 20001012; EP 1166029 A1 20020102; EP 1166029 B1 20020925; EP 1166029 B2 20051207; ES 2181645 T3 20030301; ES 2181645 T5 20060616; WO 0060300 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070217

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070218

2006-06-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-06-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-03-28 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-12-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL DEFENCE ELECTRONICS GMBH

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1166029E

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181645 T3

2003-02-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INDUSTRIEANLAGEN-BETRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000567 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE