Global Patent Index - EP 1166639 A4

EP 1166639 A4 2003-06-18 - FOAMED CHOCOLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

FOAMED CHOCOLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

GESCHAEUMTE SCHOKOLADE UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CHOCOLAT ALVEOLE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1166639 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00913000 A

Priority

  • JP 0002050 W
  • JP 8906099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1166639A1] A foamed chocolate which can be foamed without resort to any special apparatus or emulsifiers, has a lightened chocolate texture and shows no oily feel. This foamed chocolate is produced by adding an oil mixture comprising an edible fat or oil with tri-saturated fatty acid glycerides containing behenic acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23G 1/00; A23D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23D 9/00 (2006.01); A23G 1/00 (2006.01); A23G 1/36 (2006.01); A23G 1/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23G 1/36 (2013.01); A23D 9/00 (2013.01); A23G 1/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1166639 A1 20020102; EP 1166639 A4 20030618; EP 1166639 B1 20050119; CN 1129365 C 20031203; CN 1353578 A 20020612; DE 60017552 D1 20050224; DE 60017552 T2 20050825; JP 3661593 B2 20050615; US 6737100 B1 20040518; WO 0057715 A1 20001005

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150330

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60017552

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FUJI OIL COMPANY, LTD.

- Free text: FUJI OIL COMPANY, LTD.#1-5, NISHISHINSAIBASHI 2-CHOME, CHUO-KU#OSAKA-SHI, OSAKA 542-0086 (JP) -TRANSFER TO- FUJI OIL COMPANY, LTD.#1-5, NISHISHINSAIBASHI 2-CHOME, CHUO-KU#OSAKA-SHI, OSAKA 542-0086 (JP)

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017552 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE