Global Patent Index - EP 1166671 A3

EP 1166671 A3 2002-11-13 - Insole

Title (en)

Insole

Title (de)

Einlegesohle

Title (fr)

Semelle intérieure

Publication

EP 1166671 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01110937 A

Priority

DE 20011334 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1166671A2] The safety shoe is fitted with a specific inner sole (1), containing a gel pad (4) in the heel area (2) as a shock absorbing device. A concave space (3) in the sole matches exactly the convex lower surface of the gel pad (4). In order to offer even more comfort, a stabilising shell (6) is attached to the heel area (2) of the sole (1) from below. The shell (6) is designed as a bottom segment (7) with a surrounding slightly inclined wall (8) at the back. There are also versions of the inner sole (1) with additional gel pads (14,15,16) in other areas like the toes or the instep.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/32 (2006.01); A43B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/142 (2013.01); A43B 7/1425 (2013.01); A43B 7/1435 (2013.01); A43B 7/144 (2013.01); A43B 7/145 (2013.01); A43B 7/1465 (2013.01); A43B 7/32 (2013.01); A43B 17/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20011334 U1 20001221; DE 50109128 D1 20060504; EP 1166671 A2 20020102; EP 1166671 A3 20021113; EP 1166671 B1 20060308

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109128 P 20060504

2006-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050225

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030405

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI