Global Patent Index - EP 1166689 A3

EP 1166689 A3 2002-11-13 - Lock for the cover of an object to be fixed on or in a wall

Title (en)

Lock for the cover of an object to be fixed on or in a wall

Title (de)

Verriegelung einer Abdeckung eines an oder in einer Wand anbringbaren Objekts

Title (fr)

Serrure pour le couvercle d'un objet à fixer sur ou dans une paroi

Publication

EP 1166689 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109395 A

Priority

DE 20010936 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1166689A2] A locking mechanism secures an item e.g. a picture frame (6) and sub-frame (4) to a wall (26) to prevent theft or unauthorized removal. The frame (6) has a rim (28) extending close to the wall (26). The locking bolt (30, 22) is inserted or removed by a tool which is placed between the rim (28) and the wall (26). The frame (6) almost completely covers the locking bolt (30,22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/0655 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010936 U1 20001005; EP 1166689 A2 20020102; EP 1166689 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030512

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI