Global Patent Index - EP 1167003 A3

EP 1167003 A3 2003-06-18 - Method of making a pneumatic tire having a tread belt

Title (en)

Method of making a pneumatic tire having a tread belt

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Luftreifens mit einer Gürtelbandage

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un pneumatique à ceinture

Publication

EP 1167003 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01115316 A

Priority

JP 2000191442 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1167003A2] A method of making a pneumatic tire (1) with a breaker (7) and a band (9), comprises: applying a raw breaker material to a cylindrical drum (F); spirally winding a plurality of parallel band cords (10) around the raw breaker material on the cylindrical drum so that angles of the windings are not more than 5 degrees with respect to the tire equator; and gradually increasing one of an average density of the band cords in the tire axial direction and an average tension of the band cords in the tire axial direction, from a center portion of the band towards each axial edge of the band during winding the band cords.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 30/30; B29D 30/16; B29D 30/60; B29D 30/70; B60C 9/20; B60C 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29D 30/30 (2006.01); B29D 30/70 (2006.01); B60C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29D 30/3028 (2013.01); B29D 30/70 (2013.01); B60C 9/2204 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1167003 A2 20020102; EP 1167003 A3 20030618; JP 2002001833 A 20020108; US 2002026979 A1 20020307; US 2004159393 A1 20040819

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050322

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2004-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29D 30/30 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29D 30/70 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29D 30/16 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29D 30/60 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60C 9/20 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60C 9/26 B

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI