Global Patent Index - EP 1167613 A3

EP 1167613 A3 2002-11-13 - Filtering unit for laundry washing machine

Title (en)

Filtering unit for laundry washing machine

Title (de)

Filter für eine Wäschewaschmaschine

Title (fr)

Filtre pour machine à laver le linge

Publication

EP 1167613 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01202124 A

Priority

IT MI20001307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1167613A2] A filtering unit for a laundry washing machine provided with a washing tank and a drain pump (10) for the conveying of the washing water from the tank to a drain pipe (8) is provided. The unit (2) comprises a filter container (4; 400) in which a filter (15; 402) for the filtering of said washing water is housed, and the filter container (4; 400) is in flow connection with said washing tank through a tubular duct (5; 500). The filter (15; 402) is provided with holes (20; 404) on one end (19; 403) that is normally associated with one end of said tubular duct (5; 500) and the unit (2) comprises a device (30; 300; 407) for moving the filter (15; 402) within the filter container (4; 400) from a first position (A; C) in which said holes (20; 404) are closed by the tubular duct (5; 500) to a second position (B; D) that allows to let said holes (20; 404) free in order to put said washing tank and said drain pipe (8) directly in communication for the outflow of the washing water in the case of obstruction of the filter (15; 402). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1167613 A2 20020102; EP 1167613 A3 20021113; EP 1167613 B1 20050112; DE 60108307 D1 20050217; DE 60108307 T2 20060112; IT 1317812 B1 20030715; IT MI20001307 A1 20011212; IT MI20001307 D0 20000612

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090605

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60108307 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI