Global Patent Index - EP 1167666 B1

EP 1167666 B1 2004-12-01 - Operating device for vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Operating device for vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Betätigungseinrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeugtürschloss

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour serrure de porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1167666 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01113465 A

Priority

DE 10031664 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1167666A1] The actuator has a transducer (1) made of an elastic material whose deformation is used to actuate the lock. The transducer is made electrically conducting by conducting tracks (6) laid in the elastic material. Changes in the electrical resistance of the conducting tracks caused by the deformation are evaluated to trigger the lock

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 81/76 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/76 (2013.01); H01H 2239/038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1167666 A1 20020102; EP 1167666 B1 20041201; DE 10031664 C1 20020103; US 2002005016 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-01-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104656 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-12-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI