Global Patent Index - EP 1168294 A3

EP 1168294 A3 2003-06-25 - Alpha blending with gamma correction

Title (en)

Alpha blending with gamma correction

Title (de)

Gamma korrigiertes Alpha-Blending

Title (fr)

Mélangeur alpha avec correction de gamma

Publication

EP 1168294 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01115455 A

Priority

  • DE 10030787 A
  • DE 10037661 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1168294A2] The method involves controlling individual image element or pixel light emission with electrical signals. The light density corresponds to a defined information value. Two information values are superimposed in one pixel by superimposing electrical signals, especially adding them according to alpha-blending, with a correction taking into account the non-linear dependency between electrical signal strength and pixel optical light density. The method involves controlling the light emission of individual image elements or pixels with electrical signals, especially voltages, whereby the light density of the light emission corresponds to a defined information value, especially a color and/or an intensity, and two information values are superimposed in one pixel to form a total value by superimposing electrical signals, especially by adding them according to the principle of alpha-blending. A correction is performed during superimposition, whereby the non-linear dependency between the strength of the electrical signal and the optical light density of the image element is taken into account. Independent claims are also included for the following: a display device for visual reproduction of graphical information and a use of the method for graphical preparation of information subjected to anti-aliasing correction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 5/10; G09G 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/10 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0673 (2013.01); G09G 2340/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1168294 A2 20020102; EP 1168294 A3 20030625; EP 1168294 B1 20081210

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-11-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114558 P 20090122

2008-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON CONTROLS AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS GMBH

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 5/10 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09G 5/02 B

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI