Global Patent Index - EP 1168924 A4

EP 1168924 A4 2002-09-04 - IN VITRO INDUCTION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T-CELLS USING DENDRITIC CELL-TUMOR CELL OR DENDRITIC CELL-VIRAL CELL DERIVED IMMUNOGENS

Title (en)

IN VITRO INDUCTION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC T-CELLS USING DENDRITIC CELL-TUMOR CELL OR DENDRITIC CELL-VIRAL CELL DERIVED IMMUNOGENS

Title (de)

IN VITRO INDUKTION VON ANTIGENSPEZIFISCHEN T-ZELLEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DENDRITISCH ZELL-TUMOR ZELLE ODER DENDRITISCH ZELL-VIRAL ZELLE DERIVATISIERTER IMMUNOGENE

Title (fr)

INDUCTION IN VITRO DE CELLULES T SPECIFIQUES A UN ANTIGENE A L'AIDE D'IMMUNOGENES DERIVES DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES-CELLULES TUMORALES OU DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES-CELLULES VIRALES

Publication

EP 1168924 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00921528 A

Priority

  • US 0008472 W
  • US 28267999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057705A1] Antigen-specific T-cells prepared by culturing T-cells in formulations comprising combinations of DCs and either tumor cells or virally infected cells are disclosed. These formulations generally comprise hybridoma of at least one dendritic cell fused to either at least one tumor cell or at least one virally infected cell, or co-cultures of dendritic cells and either tumor cells or virally infected cells. The resulting T-cells can then be used in immunotherapy methods through adoptive transfer of autologous antigen-specific T-cells into patients using well-established techniques, as agents to identify tumor antigens, and to establish animal models.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; C12N 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/02 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C12N 5/0783 (2010.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 5/16 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0636 (2013.01); C12N 5/16 (2013.01); A61K 2039/5158 (2013.01); C12N 2501/22 (2013.01); C12N 2501/23 (2013.01); C12N 2502/30 (2013.01); C12N 2502/99 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9630030 A1 19961003 - BAXTER INT [US], et al
  • [PX] WO 9937313 A1 19990729 - GENZYME CORP [US], et al
  • [X] CELLUZZI CHRISTINA M ET AL: "Immunization with dendritic cells fused with tumor cells elicits potent tumor specific immunity.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, vol. 108, no. 4, 1997, Annual Meeting of the Society for Investigative Dermatology;Washington, D.C., USA; April 23-27, 1997, pages 564, XP002919847, ISSN: 0022-202X
  • [X] GONG J ET AL: "INDUCTION OF ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY BY IMMUNIZATION WITH FUSIONS OF DENDRITIC AND CARCINOMA CELLS", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, vol. 3, no. 5, May 1997 (1997-05-01), pages 558 - 561, XP002910553, ISSN: 1078-8956
  • [X] CELLUZZI C M ET AL: "Physical interaction between dendritic cells and tumor cells results in an immunogen that induces protective and therapeutic tumor rejection", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, vol. 160, no. 7, 1 April 1998 (1998-04-01), pages 3081 - 3085, XP002167051, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [X] WANG J ET AL: "Eliciting T cell immunity against poorly immunogenic tumors by immunization with dendritic cell-tumor fusion vaccines", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, US, vol. 161, 1998, pages 5516 - 5524, XP002171426, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [X] GONG J L ET AL: "FUSION OF HUMAN BREAST TUMOR AND DENDRITIC CELLS AS A NOVEL ANTITUMOR VACCINE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 89TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. NEW ORLEANS, LA, MARCH 28 - APRIL 1, 1998, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, PHILADELPHIA, PA: AACR, US, vol. 39, March 1998 (1998-03-01), pages 172, XP002910557
  • See also references of WO 0057705A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057705 A1 20001005; AU 4183100 A 20001016; CA 2367590 A1 20001005; CN 1353575 A 20020612; EP 1168924 A1 20020109; EP 1168924 A4 20020904; JP 2002539805 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01N 63/00 A, 7C 12N 5/12 B

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI