Global Patent Index - EP 1169179 B1

EP 1169179 B1 2003-06-11 - DATA CARRIER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

DATA CARRIER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE DONNEES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT SUPPORT

Publication

EP 1169179 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00906137 A

Priority

  • CH 0000137 W
  • CH 64999 A
  • CH 182799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0061379A1] The data carrier is preferably an identity card or payment card and is provided with at least one layer (3) forming a card body, a transparent outer layer (2) laminated thereon and a planar security element (8) that is arranged between two laminated layers (2, 3) and that is covered by a protective layer (7). At least one of the laminated layers (2) is transparent. The security element (8) laminated therein is provided with especially holographic or kinegraphic information and is particularly protected against damage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/23 (2014.10); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 25/328 (2013.01); B42D 25/45 (2014.10); B42D 25/373 (2014.10); Y10T 428/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0061379 A1 20001019; AT 242700 T 20030615; AU 2792100 A 20001114; CA 2368056 A1 20001019; CA 2368056 C 20080429; DE 50002540 D1 20030717; EP 1169179 A1 20020109; EP 1169179 B1 20030611; EP 1169179 B2 20121114; ES 2199775 T3 20040301; ES 2199775 T5 20130326; ME 01365 B 20070803; PL 198387 B1 20080630; PL 350790 A1 20030210; PT 1169179 E 20031031; RS 49615 B 20070803; US 6722700 B1 20040420; YU 70801 A 20030707

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170301

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG, CH

- Document: AT 242700 T

- Effective date: 20160726

2016-02-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-03 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG; CH

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: TRUEB AG

- Effective date: 20151009

2015-12-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002540

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OLBRICHT, BUCHHOLD, KEULERTZ PA, DE

2015-09-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG, CH

- Effective date: 20150813

2015-08-10 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG

- Effective date: 20150804

2015-07-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG, CH

- Effective date: 20150709

2015-07-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRUEB AG, AARAU, CH

- Document: DE 50002540

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002540

- Representative's name: HEINRICH ERB PARTNER RECHTSANWAELTE PATENTANWA, DE

2015-07-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002540

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OLBRICHT, BUCHHOLD, KEULERTZ PA, DE

2015-06-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150521 AND 20150527

2015-05-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEMALTO AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TRUEB AG, CH

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20130400291

- Effective date: 20130327

2013-03-26 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2199775 T5

- Effective date: 20130326

2013-03-13 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-02-19 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2013-01-03 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50002540

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-11-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2012-11-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20121114

2012-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-04-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2006-01-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199775 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403483

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002540 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: LT LV RO

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUEB AG

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20011102;LV PAYMENT 20011102;RO PAYMENT 20011102