EP 1170413 A3 20020904 - Water-soluble interlining for an embroidery base fabric
Title (en)
Water-soluble interlining for an embroidery base fabric
Title (de)
Wasserlösliche Stickerei-Fixiereinlage
Title (fr)
Renfort soluble dans l'eau pour tissu de broderie
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10032769 A 20000705
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1170413A2] Water-soluble lining for fixing embroidery comprises a water-soluble fleece with a mass/unit area of 20-120 g/m<2> coated with a water-soluble thermoplastic polymer as adhesive. An Independent claim is also included for the production of this lining.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
D04H 1/4309 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2006.01); D04H 1/559 (2012.01); D04H 1/58 (2006.01); D04H 1/587 (2012.01); D04H 1/593 (2012.01); D04H 1/64 (2006.01); D04H 13/00 (2006.01); D05C 17/00 (2006.01); D06M 17/00 (2006.01); D06M 17/04 (2006.01); D06M 17/06 (2006.01); D06M 17/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR US)
D04H 1/4309 (2013.01 - EP US); D04H 1/559 (2013.01 - EP US); D04H 1/587 (2013.01 - EP US); D04H 1/593 (2013.01 - EP US); D04H 1/64 (2013.01 - EP US); D05C 17/00 (2013.01 - EP KR US); D06M 17/04 (2013.01 - EP US); D06M 17/06 (2013.01 - EP US); D06M 17/08 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24 (2015.01 - EP US); Y10T 442/2738 (2015.04 - EP US); Y10T 442/60 (2015.04 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [DA] DE 4343230 A1 19950622 - MEI CHUAN EMBROIDERY ENTERPRIS [TW]
- [A] EP 0081218 A2 19830615 - FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]
- [DA] WO 9956519 A2 19991111 - SIBER HEGNER & CO LTD [CH], et al
- [A] EP 1010794 A1 20000621 - TOKAI IND SEWING MACHINE [JP]
- [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 01 31 January 2000 (2000-01-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 201 (C - 1188) 8 April 1994 (1994-04-08)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1170413 A2 20020109; EP 1170413 A3 20020904; DE 10032769 A1 20020124; DE 10032769 C2 20031204; JP 2002069828 A 20020308; KR 20020003511 A 20020112; US 2002004347 A1 20020110
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01110903 A 20010505; DE 10032769 A 20000705; JP 2001186653 A 20010620; KR 20010039234 A 20010702; US 89870001 A 20010703