Global Patent Index - EP 1170420 A3

EP 1170420 A3 2002-11-06 - Apparatus for measuring the track location during the laying of railway tracks and method for performing such measurement

Title (en)

Apparatus for measuring the track location during the laying of railway tracks and method for performing such measurement

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Messung der Gleislage bei der Herstellung von Schienenfahrbahnen und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer solchen Messung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure de la position d'une voie en cours de pose de voies ferrées et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une telle mesure

Publication

EP 1170420 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01116110 A

Priority

DE 10032364 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1170420A2] A measuring device has forward (1) and return (2) motion applied to each rail (3) to be measured while retaining a fixed side and height position on one of the two rails (4,4') on the measuring rail (4). Between the rear end of the forward motion and the front end of the return motion there is a flexible coupling rod (5) to guarantee a fixed distance between forward and return motion. During return motion there is a laser (10) on the rear end of a limb (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 35/04; E01B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 35/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1170420 A2 20020109; EP 1170420 A3 20021106; DE 10032364 A1 20020124

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060529

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01B 35/04 A, 7E 01B 35/00 B

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI