Global Patent Index - EP 1171367 B1

EP 1171367 B1 2003-06-18 - FIXING ELEMENT FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID PRODUCT AND DISPENSER COMPRISING SAID ELEMENT

Title (en)

FIXING ELEMENT FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID PRODUCT AND DISPENSER COMPRISING SAID ELEMENT

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN UND ABGABEVORRICHTUNG DIE EIN SOLCHES ELEMENT ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE FIXATION POUR DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE ET DISTRIBUTEUR COMPORTANT UN TEL ORGANE

Publication

EP 1171367 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00912718 A

Priority

  • FR 0000686 W
  • FR 9904770 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2792295A1] Body (20) of pump (2) has fixing ring (3) with skirt (30) extending in contact of inner wall (11) of neck (10). Outer wall of skirt has outer radial projection (32) that can be placed in recess (12) in inner wall (11). Ring has flange (31) stopping on upper end of neck to fix position of skirt inside neck. Locking ring (4) is forced inside skirt as far as recess of inner wall of neck. An Independent claim is also included for the method for assembling liquid product dispenser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/38 (2013.01); B05B 11/0013 (2013.01); B05B 11/3047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2792295 A1 20001020; FR 2792295 B1 20010622; DE 60003414 D1 20030724; DE 60003414 T2 20040519; EP 1171367 A1 20020116; EP 1171367 B1 20030618; ES 2199794 T3 20040301; US 6527149 B1 20030304; WO 0063094 A1 20001026; WO 0063095 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080320

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080322

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080320

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080322

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080320

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199794 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003414 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011107

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE