Global Patent Index - EP 1171552 B1

EP 1171552 B1 2003-06-18 - HYDRAULIC FLUIDS, CONTAINING CYCLIC CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC FLUIDS, CONTAINING CYCLIC CARBOXYLIC ACID DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN, ENTHALTEND CYCLISCHE CARBONSÄUREDERIVATE

Title (fr)

LIQUIDES HYDRAULIQUES CONTENANT DES DERIVES CYCLIQUES D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE

Publication

EP 1171552 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00922626 A

Priority

  • DE 19918199 A
  • EP 0003230 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918199A1] Hydraulic fluids containing 0.01-50 wt% cyclic carboxylic acid derivative(s) in the form of a lactone(s) or lactam(s) with 4-9 atoms in the ring. Hydraulic fluids containing 0.01-50 wt% cyclic carboxylic acid derivative(s) of formula (I). X = O or NR<1>; R<1> = H, 1-20C linear or branched alkyl (optionally with up to 9 non-adjacent in-chain oxygen atoms and/or up to 6 hydroxyl group substituents), cycloalkyl or optionally substituted phenyl; A = -CR<2>R<3>-; R<2>, R<3> = H or 1-8C alkyl (optionally with up to 4 non-adjacent in-chain O atoms and/or up to 3 OH groups); and n = 2-7. An Independent claim is also included for motor vehicle brake fluid containing 0.01-50 wt.% (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 129/24; C10M 133/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/34 (2006.01); C10M 105/70 (2006.01); C10M 129/20 (2006.01); C10M 129/24 (2006.01); C10M 129/70 (2006.01); C10M 133/38 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/02 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/12 (2006.01); C10N 40/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/20 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 107/52 (2013.01); C10M 129/14 (2013.01); C10M 133/08 (2013.01); C10M 133/32 (2013.01); C10M 133/38 (2013.01); C10M 133/44 (2013.01); C10M 145/26 (2013.01); C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/044 (2013.01); C10M 2209/103 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/105 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/106 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/202 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2229/003 (2013.01); C10N 2240/08 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2215/223 + C10M 2215/223

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19918199 A1 20001026; AT 243248 T 20030715; CA 2367913 A1 20001102; CA 2367913 C 20080108; DE 50002594 D1 20030724; EP 1171552 A1 20020116; EP 1171552 B1 20030618; ES 2202113 T3 20040401; JP 2002543238 A 20021217; KR 100660953 B1 20061226; PT 1171552 E 20031031; US 6783693 B1 20040831; WO 0065001 A1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002594

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002594

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130412

2014-06-13 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130411

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130412

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130411

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243248 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-12-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BASF A.G.

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120501

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080411

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081013

2008-10-24 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20081013

2007-04-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070404

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040411

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2202113 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-09-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002594 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011023

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE