Global Patent Index - EP 1171693 B1

EP 1171693 B1 2002-11-13 - LOAD CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR EFFECTING THE EMERGENCY OPERATION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

LOAD CONTROL CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR EFFECTING THE EMERGENCY OPERATION OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

SCHALTUNG ZUR LASTSTEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM NOTLAUFBETRIEB EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'URGENCE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1171693 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00934888 A

Priority

  • DE 0001117 W
  • DE 19918032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0063535A1] During the failure or disruption of the data interchange between the valve control unit (1, 2) and the operation control unit (9) of an internal combustion engine comprising electromechanically actuated intake valves (5a, 5b), the valve control unit (1, 2) changes the electromechanical actuation of the intake valves (5a, 5b) to full load control times, and the operation control unit (9) adjusts a throttle valve (12) in order effect the load control of the internal combustion engine in a manner which no longer uses valve load control, but uses throttle valve load control during emergency operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02D 41/266 (2013.01); F01L 2201/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0063535 A1 20001026; DE 19918032 C1 20001116; EP 1171693 A1 20020116; EP 1171693 B1 20021113; JP 2002542421 A 20021210; US 2002072837 A1 20020613; US 6567740 B2 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100411

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1171693E

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000759 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE