Global Patent Index - EP 1171857 B1

EP 1171857 B1 2003-06-18 - INTRUDER DETECTION SYSTEM WITH A VIDEO TELEPHONE

Title (en)

INTRUDER DETECTION SYSTEM WITH A VIDEO TELEPHONE

Title (de)

EINBRUCHSERKENNUNG MIT EINEM BILDTELEFON

Title (fr)

DETECTION D'INTRUSION PAR UN VISIOPHONE

Publication

EP 1171857 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929010 A

Priority

DE 9901189 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0063862A1] The invention relates to a surveillance method with a wireless video telephone system. According to the invention, a base station is connected to a communications network and a mobile video unit with a camera is used for surveillance. A current recorded image is checked for changes and an alarm is triggered and a surveillance unit is dialled if a predetermined difference is detected. The image that has triggered the alarm is immediately transmitted from the mobile unit to the base station where it is stored, at least until being delivered to the communications network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00; G08B 13/194

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/194 (2006.01); G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/1966 (2013.01); G08B 13/19602 (2013.01); G08B 13/19621 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0063862 A1 20001026; DE 59906047 D1 20030724; EP 1171857 A1 20020116; EP 1171857 B1 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100420

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100420

2010-11-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101028 AND 20101103

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906047 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010809

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB