Global Patent Index - EP 1172154 A3

EP 1172154 A3 2003-06-18 - Cartridge for dispensing a material

Title (en)

Cartridge for dispensing a material

Title (de)

Kartusche zum Ausbringen einer Masse

Title (fr)

Cartouche pour délivrer une matière

Publication

EP 1172154 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01111093 A

Priority

DE 10033748 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1172154A2] The cartridge for application of a mass preferably comprising two components has a mouthpiece nozzle, to which can be connected a closure cap and a static mixer. These connectable items (8) have a one-piece connection with a sleeve. The outer surface (5) of the mouthpiece nozzle (2) and the inner surfaace (11) of the sleeve are insertable in one another conically and sealingly. On the inner surface of the sleeve locking pins (12) are provided, which engage in guide grooves (13) of the outer surface of the mouthpiece nozzle to form a bayonet closure. The guide grooves run from the edge of the mouthpiece nozzle firstly axially and then peripherally in the foot area of the mouthpiece nozzle. Two concentric chambers (20,21) are arranged in the mouthpiece nozzle and in the sleeve of the closure cap are two supports (24,25) which sealingly engage in the outlet apertures (3,4) of the two chambers (20,21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/005; B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/52 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00509 (2013.01); B05C 17/0052 (2013.01); B65D 81/3227 (2013.01); B05C 17/00553 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1172154 A2 20020116; EP 1172154 A3 20030618; CZ 20012552 A3 20020213; CZ 296183 B6 20060111; DE 10033748 A1 20020124; HU 0102377 A2 20020429; HU 0102377 A3 20020528; HU 0102377 D0 20010828; PL 348592 A1 20020114

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061212

2006-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060731

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI