Global Patent Index - EP 1172501 A3

EP 1172501 A3 2003-06-04 - Connecting element

Title (en)

Connecting element

Title (de)

Verbindungselement

Title (fr)

Element d'assemblage

Publication

EP 1172501 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 01401769 A

Priority

FR 0009188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1172501A2] The decorative assembly, designed to be applied to a supporting surface (P), consists of panels (10A, 10B) with grooves (14) to simulate wall tiles, joined by male and female edges (16B, 18A). The male edge has a rim (20) which is connected to the visible surface (12B) by a projection (22) and has a raised ridge (24). The female edge has free end (28) which is connected to the visible surface by a projection (30) and an inner cavity (32) to receive the ridge of the male edge and mastic seals (34, 36). The panels are made e.g. from a thermoplastic material with an inner plate (50A, 50B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; F16B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/18 (2013.01); E04F 13/0876 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1172501 A2 20020116; EP 1172501 A3 20030604; CN 1333409 A 20020130; FR 2811725 A1 20020118; FR 2811725 B1 20021031; PL 348655 A1 20020114; US 2002043609 A1 20020418

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI